Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midlands Management Of Texas, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mccathern, Levi G, Ii, against Diloreto, Michael J., Gohr, Martin, Jdi Insurance By Design Agency, Llc, Jdi Risk Advisors Llc, represented by Harrington, Darren S, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
APPLICATION - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: December 03, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 15, 2014MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 11, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2014MOTION - EXTEND
Date: December 15, 2014MOTION - RELEASE BOND
Date: January 23, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 02, 2014MOTION - DISMISS
Date: January 23, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 23, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
REGISTRY DEPOSIT RECEIPT TRO |
|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - RELEASE BOND COPY SENT TO TRUST |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Gohr, Martin 12-11-14 CONFIDENTIAL Reporter's Certification. CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF MARTIN GOHR |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION settled |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING $500.000 TRO BOND |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion for Order Releasing Bond MOTION - RELEASE BOND AGREED |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerk - fwd prop Dismissal Order, 1-23-15 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerk - fwd prop Order releasing Bond, 1-23-15 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: AGREED MOTION AND ORDER RELEASING $500.00 TRO BOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.