Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Salas, Sergio R., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Pletta, Timothy Gerard, against Intercapital Sanger Trails, Llc, represented by Suster, Israel, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - NONSUIT
Date: October 01, 2015RULE 11
Date: February 17, 2015AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 08, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 07, 2015MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 25, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 01, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 25, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF ORDER NONSUIT TO PLTF AND DEF |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION settled |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit (00246715) MOTION - NONSUIT |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Nonsuit (00246716) NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT R3E: PROPOSED ORDER NONSUIT |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER NONSUIT SUBMITTED TO ADMIN'S QUEUE |
|
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Non Jury Trial |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER CONTINUANCE SENT TO THE COORDINATOR. |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER CONTINUANCE SUBMITTED |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Motion for Continuance (00238262) MOTION - CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.