Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Su, Lee, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Carroll, James Brendan, Iii, against Rodriguez, Raul G., represented by Clements, Darrell L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 17, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 30, 2015MOTION - DISMISS
Date: October 30, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Initial Trial Setting (Expedited) |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS FORWARD AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO ADMIN QUEUE |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ORDER PERMITTING DISM SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
|
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ORDER PERMITTING DISMISSAL SIGNED 10-30-2015. ORIG/CLERK |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER EXPEDITED ACTION |
|
May 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR COURT'S SCHED ORDER SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR SCHED ORDER SIGNED 5-5-2015. COPY ALL & MEDIATOR. ORIG/CLERK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.