Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Puebla, Manuel, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gandara, Cassandra M., against Borreol, Luis, Darling Frisco Partners, Ltd, Darling Homes Of Dallas Ltd, Darling Homes Of Texas Llc, Dhd Interest Ltd, (total of 5) See All represented by Alcala, Diana, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with MOLBERG, KEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 11, 2015MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 02, 2014AMENDED PETITION
Date: December 02, 2014MOTION - QUASH
Date: January 30, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 31, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 11, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 05, 2015MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: September 03, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2015MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to Clerk: Order of Dismissal for Want of Proseuction - signed 11/15/2015 - close - copy mailed to all. |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (NON JURY) Non Jury Trial |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Continuance NICOLE / 512-263-8408 / 15MIN |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to Clerk: Order Granting Summary Judgment - signed 10/21/2015. |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Darling's Mtn for Summary Judgment MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance MOTION - CONTINUANCE |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - JUDGMENT DEF PYRAMID DRYWALL, INC , JOSE J TORRES, AND JUAN J. HERRERA |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | MANDATE DISMISS | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.