Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Mesa Petroleum Partners Lp, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Castaneda, Chrysta, against Baytech Llp, Delaware Basin Resources Llc, J Cleo Thompson & James Cleo Thompson Jr Lp, Patriot Resources Inc., represented by Bracken, Geoffrey H, Hollimon, Stuart C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with GINSBERG, CARL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: January 07, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 05, 2015MOTION - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: January 23, 2015SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: January 07, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 01, 2014COUNTER CLAIM
Date: January 05, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2015MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: March 25, 2015MOTION - EXTEND
Date: March 16, 2015REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 08, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 09, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 24, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 10, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 14, 2015CITATION ISSUED
Date: December 11, 2014MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 02, 2015MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 02, 2015RESPONSE
Date: February 12, 2015AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 14, 2015ORDER - PROTECT
Date: February 22, 2015ORDER - LIMINE
Date: January 07, 2015NOTE - CLERKS
Date: June 06, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 06, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 08, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 23, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 29, 2015ORDER - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: January 25, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 14, 2015MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: January 05, 2015REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 03, 2015ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 17, 2015MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 02, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 01, 2014MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: March 25, 2015MOTION - EXTEND
Date: March 16, 2015MOTION - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: January 23, 2015MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: January 05, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 05, 2015REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2014COUNTER CLAIM
Date: January 05, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 23, 2015RESPONSE
Date: February 12, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2015AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
June 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS CONFIRMATION RECEIVED 4/16/15 FROM REEVES CO. NEW CAUSE NUMBER NOT AVAILABLE YET |
|
June 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS CONFIRMATION RECEIVED 4/16/15 FROM REEVES CO. NEW CAUSE NUMBER NOT AVAILABLE YET |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Transfer DEF ( J.CLEO) TRANSFER FILED 1/5/15 DEF (BAYTECH PATRICK TRANSFER FILED 1/5/15 AND DEF (DELAWARE BASIN) TRANSFER FILED 1/23/15 FOR 1 HOUR |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion - Transfer DEF ( J.CLEO) TRANSFER FILED 1/5/15 DEF (BAYTECH PATRICK TRANSFER FILED 1/5/15 AND DEF (DELAWARE BASIN) TRANSFER FILED 1/23/15 FOR 1 HOUR |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE CASE TRANSFERED TO REEVES COUNTY VIA CERT MAIL/92148901066154000056135387/ SLA |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE CASE TRANSFERED TO REEVES COUNTY VIA CERT MAIL/92148901066154000056135387/ SLA |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CC TRANSFER | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CC TRANSFER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.