Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bonilla, Salvador, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Showalter, Jesse R, against Pappas Restaurants, Inc., represented by Kurzner, Christopher Lou, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with GINSBERG, CARL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 01, 2014ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 16, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2016MOTION - DISMISS
Date: May 24, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Pages from Motion and order of dismissal 20160323 NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT & MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE |
|
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion and order of dismissal 20160323 MOTION - DISMISS AGREED WITH PREJUDICE |
|
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS FORWARD AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO ADMIN QUEUE. |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
PAPPAS RESTAURANTS, INC. - CITATION RETURN OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/OFFICER'S RETURN |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
TRANSMITTAL LTR MEDIATOR FEE ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT MEDIATOR FEE ORDER |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MEDIATION FEES |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MEDIATOR FEE ORDER SUBMITTED |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MEDIATION GERALD LIVINGSTON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.