Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Conkle, James L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lieberman, Mark Joel, against Marlow, Shelia, represented by Dunham, Douglas K, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
SETTLED
Date: June 16, 2016CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 02, 2015AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 15, 2016RESPONSE
Date: February 15, 2016MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 21, 2016ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 01, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 15, 2016DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 22, 2016NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 05, 2016ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
101st Jury Trial Notice 1 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
101st NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS (2) DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/DISMISS SUBMITTED |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED DISMISS |
|
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ltr to Judge re settlement SETTLED AT MEDIATION |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Non Jury Trial |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE JOINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.