Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Morris, Rodney, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Holmgren, Dennis M., against Mcleod, Rodney, represented by Cunningham, Vickers L, Long, Sarah Holley, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with BROWN, PHYLLIS LISTER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 30, 2015RESPONSE
Date: April 17, 2015RESPONSE
Date: April 20, 2015RESPONSE
Date: April 15, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 22, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SUBMITTED TO ADMIN QUEUE |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee) MOTION - DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESP/C-MOTION COMPEL RESPONSE Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Counter-Motion to Compel |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court with proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER COMPEL - REGARDING HEARING SET 04-20-15 AT 1:30 ADMIN QUE |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY PLEA ABATEMENT |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Plea in Abatement 30 MIN LANCE 972/764-7716 CC REQ & M/COMPEL DENNIS HOLMGREM 972/484-7780 CC REQ |
|
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Plea in Abateme RESPONSE Defendant Rodney McLeod=s Reply to Plaintiff s Response to Plea in Abatement and Motion for Sanctions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.