Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Elzner, Corey, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Anderson, Theodore Carl, Tremain, Ashley E, against Cypress Associates, Inc., represented by Little, J Mitchell, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 19, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 19, 2015COUNTER CLAIM
Date: December 30, 2014ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 01, 2014MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 17, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 17, 2015AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 19, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 30, 2014MOTION - DISMISS
Date: July 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Final Disposition Hearing (SETTLED * LETTER 5-7-15) |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed_Order_of_Dismissal NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion_to_Dismiss_with_Prejudice MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL SUBM. TO ADMIN QUE |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Final Disposition Hearing (SETTLED * LETTER 5-7-15) |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
E47797 ELZNER VS CYPRESS KR SETTLED FULL SETTLEMENT |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Joint_Notice_of_Agreed_Mediator MOTION - MISCELLANOUS Joint Notice of Mediator |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL J MITCHELL LITTLE |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Special Exceptions SPECIAL EXCPTS FILED W ORIG ANS FILED 01/19/15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.