Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chapman, Zaneka, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Areola, Rotimi, against Haggerty, D.D.S, Bruce, represented by Raff, David D., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with MOLBERG, KEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOLBERG, KEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 31, 2014MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: October 17, 2014ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 30, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS LETTER TO JUDGE RE: MINOR PROVE UP SUBMITTED TO ADMIN |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE TO JUDGE RE: MINOR PROVE UP HEARING |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
1060090L.K01 encl Settlement Funds CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: FUNDS |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT MAILED - COPY ALL |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to Clerk: Order Discharging Guardian Ad Litem- signed 12/12/2014. |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to Clerk: Agreed Final Judgment - signed 12/12/2014 - close |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Minor Prove Up | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MISC. DISCHARGING GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Minor Prove-Up hearing re-set. Notice faxed to all counsel and to GAL. |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter to Judge 11.4.14 (1) CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE Letter to Judge RE: Guardian Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.