Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
H.D. Smith Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Vickers, Philip A, against Preston Village Pharmacy Llc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with JORDAN, JIM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJORDAN, JIM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 30, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 17, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 17, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE LETTER TO COURT WITH PROPOSED AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS AGREED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO ADMIN |
|
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE PRESTON VILLAGE PHARMACY | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CITATION AA/ATTY |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.