Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Texans Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Blalack, Chris, against Bell, Garry W, Bell, Judy, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with BROWN, PHYLLIS LISTER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBROWN, PHYLLIS LISTER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 30, 2014REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT JUDGMENT | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AJ (00253441xB31C2) REQUEST FOR SERVICE REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
ISSUE ABSTRACT Postage Paid. |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/DFLT TO ADMIN Q |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JUDGMENT (00218880) NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT COVER LETTER ENC. MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE CITATION | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO JUDY BELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.