Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Laboratory Corporation Of America, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mccorkindale, D Kevin, against Choice Clinical Lab, L.L.C., represented by Brotherton, William J, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with GOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOLDSTEIN, BONNIE LEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 14, 2014ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE | |
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AnswerOrig ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - CHOICE CLINICAL LB, L.L.C. | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED ATTY/AF |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE FILING COVER SHEET Petition |
|
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.