Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Williams, Sabrina Deane, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bender, Jodi, against Alfaro, Felicitas, Dallas County Community College District, El Centro College, Leonard, Melanie, represented by Brandt, Tom, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with GINSBERG, CARL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGINSBERG, CARL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 31, 2014REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL SUBMITTED |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
CITATION ISSUED CU-ATTY |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Defendant's Notice of Filing of Removal to Federal Court |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE CITATION REQUEST |
|
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION - TEMPORARY INJUNCTION APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION |
|
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
2014-10-31 First Amended Petition AMENDED PETITION FIRST |
|
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE 1 ATTY SUBP D/T ISSUED EXEC 10/20/14 ( TEXAS HEALTH RESOURCES) TARRANT CO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.