Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Konate, Rachid, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Groce, John M, Jr., against Rodriguez, Antonio, represented by Garcia-Sanders, Carrie L, Henderson, Scott A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 25, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 14, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 10, 2015REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 30, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2014MOTION - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: November 14, 2014ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 03, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 25, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION WHITE ROCK OPEN AIR MRI - RADIOLOGY |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Settled |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT O/NONSUIT |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/NONSUIT-JUDGE'S QUEUE |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION 1ST AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENTION TO WHITE ROCK OPEN AIR MRI |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event | SETTLED | |
September 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS SENT 9/15-LETTER TO ADMIN QUEUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.