Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Daffron, Patricia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Groce, John M, Jr., Hyde, Dorothy Mulchihy, against Willis, William, represented by Whatley, Ashley G., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLAUGHTER, GENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: November 24, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 30, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order For Withdrawal Of Counsel NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/WITHDRAW ATTY TO ADMIN |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE AGREED ORDER DISMISSAL |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS AGREED DISMISSAL SUBMITTED 11/10 |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED ORDER DISMISSAL |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DOROTHY M. HYDE |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - DEFENDANT DEFENDANT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.