Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alvarez, Eldom, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Walton, Roger D, against Hung Enterprises, Inc. A K A Hung Equities - North Hills, Inc. D B A North Hills Place Apartments, Sunridge Management Group, Inc., represented by Buchanan, Angela M., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOFFMAN, MARTIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2014 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 28, 2015SETTLED
Date: August 17, 2015AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 29, 2015MOTION - DISMISS
Date: August 28, 2015AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 29, 2015MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 30, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 23, 2015OBJECTION
Date: March 27, 2015OBJECTION
Date: January 23, 2015ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 24, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF AGREED ORDER DISMISSAL TO PLTF AND DEF |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE MOTION - DISMISS |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER DISMISSAL SUBMITTED TO ADMIN'S QUEUE |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT RE: PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSAL |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS SETTLEMENT LETTER SUBMITTED TO ADMIN'S QUEUE |
|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGE LETTER - SETTLED PRIOR SETTLED |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO LIABILITY ONLY (NO ORDER) |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.