Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Allen, Kennie Rashard, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cohen, Joshua A, Herbert, Zachary D, Lavery, Brandon, against Hughes, Alford, represented by Kim, Eugene Y, Whitehurst, Mary E, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with MOLBERG, KEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 04, 2015MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 21, 2015MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: June 05, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2015MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: June 08, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 14, 2014ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 22, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 21, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2016MOTION - STRIKE
Date: October 09, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 15, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
20160712 ALLEN KENNIE FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS FINAL JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO ADMIN QUEUE |
|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to clerk: Charge of the Court. |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Fax to counsel: Final Judgment. |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR to Clerk: Final Judgment - signed 6/21/2016 - copy faxed and mailed to all counsel. |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | JURY SWORN PANEL (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.