Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Molina Jr., Jose A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lavery, Brandon, against Rosas Jr., Juan D., represented by Balido, Carlos A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 26, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 25, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 28, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 16, 2015MOTION - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: October 10, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 25, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 10, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Initial Trial Setting (Level 2) |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ORDER DISM W/PREJ SIGNED 1-22-2015. ORIG/CLERK |
|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF AGREED ORDER DISMISSAL TO PLTF AND DEF |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR AGRD ORDER OF DISM W/PREJ SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: AGREED DISMISSAL |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NON - SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS O/ AGREED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SUBMITTED TO ADMIN QUEUE |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT. |
|
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT CERTIFIED POLICE REPORT. |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR ORDER SUBST MEDIATOR SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.