Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lutea Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Moorse, Cody J, against Bank Of America, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with LOWY, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2014 |
CategoryGarnishment After Jgmt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 21, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT MAILED 5-12-14 |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE GARNISHMENT MAILED 5-12-14 |
|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE FILING COVER SHEET | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.