Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alvear, Felipe, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Freefield, Brent Stewart, against Ramirez, Manuel A., represented by Wilkinson, Kamela Ann, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 23, 2014SETTLED
Date: October 14, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Settled |
|
November 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY ALL |
|
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS TO QUE O/DISMISS |
|
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ORDER OF DISMISSAL TO JUDGE QUE |
|
November 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
JUDGE LETTER - SETTLED SETTLED |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS VACA LETTER TO DC CIVIL VACATION LETTER QUEUE |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.