Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bolen, Troy D, against Kandice Clark Aka Kandice E Clark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with LOWY, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2014 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 03, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 03, 2014ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 29, 2014NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2014RELEASE OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 08, 2018NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: September 26, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Clark,Kandice.SatisfactionofJudgment.2018.06.08 RELEASE OF JUDGMENT Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
September 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED PLTF'S ATTY & TO DEFT |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion - Default Judgment SUBMISSION ONLY |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NON SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Status Conference RESET IF D SERVED |
|
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.