Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Turner, Earl L, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case against Barrett Daffin Frappier Turner & Engel Llp, Matt Lindsey, Robert Forster, Robert Maris Or Lisle Patton Substitute Trustee, Mcdonald, Elizabeth, Nationstar Mortgage Llc, represented by Hanson, Thomas M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 07, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Injunction | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Turner Answer ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE SUBPOENA | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM NOT PREPARED BY DALLAS COUNTY |
|
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
April 29, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE TRO AND NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.