Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Village Of Runyon Springs Homeowners' Association, Inc., filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Kapioltas, Thomas L, against Bustos, Lucia, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with LOWY, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2014 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 29, 2014MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 19, 2014WRIT ISSUED
Date: November 25, 2015REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: November 05, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 19, 2014NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: September 02, 2014REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2015NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 19, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE Service of Order of Sale (SENT TO PCT 1 12/18/15) |
|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF SALE DC1404563 WRIT ISSUED |
|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF SALE 218/368 ESERVE RR |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bustos - Judgment REQUEST FOR SERVICE ORDER OF SALE REQUEST |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ISSUE ORDER OF SALE | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF SALE 217/281 - SHF 1 |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
RUNYON - BUSTOS - ORDER OF SALE REQUEST FOR SERVICE REQUEST |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE ORDER OF SALE | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED PLTF'S ATTY & TO DEFT |
|
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Status Conference SET BY JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.