Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hanzik, Edward, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gorsky, Bob, against State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company Of Texas, represented by Renwick, Malcolm G, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: August 07, 2012CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 31, 2011ORDER - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: August 05, 2011ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: April 11, 2012MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 04, 2012MOTION - COMPEL
Date: June 02, 2011CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 02, 2012ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 27, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2010SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 10, 2011ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 26, 2012CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 02, 2011MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 23, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT JUDGMENT - MAIL ATTY |
|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event | POST JUDGMENT BILL | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
09-21-2012 - Miscellaneous Event CV - DC1016813 - 10548636 MISCELLANOUS EVENT INVOICE FROM THE MEDIATOR'S OFFICE EVIDENCING THE COST PER PARTY FOR MEDIATION |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
8-7-2012 - Notice of Judgment Mailed CV - DC1016813 - 9745310 NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS Submitted Charge Ticket for Bailiff fee |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Hearing JUDGMENT SUBMITTED |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR JUDGMENT (JURY TRIAL) SIGNED 8-6-2012. ORIG/CLERK |
|
August 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS Mailed copy of JUDGMENT to Plaintiff and Def |
|
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR (JURY TRIAL) JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.