Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Allstate Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tessmer, Heather C, against Girma, Elisabeth, represented by Austin, Brandy M., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with JORDAN, JIM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2010MOTION - LEAVE
Date: April 08, 2011ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 08, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Order on Nonsuit signed 5/31/11 |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
09-27-2011 - Return of Service CV - DC1016792 - 5518478 RETURN OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF LOST ORIGINAL CITATION (ELISABETH GIRMA 4/1/11) PPS |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
05-31-2011 - Notice of NonSuit CV - DC1016792 - 4298483 NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
05-12-2011 - Notice of Change of Address CV - DC1016792 - 4136483 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Def Original Answer filed 4/8/11 |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Notice Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution- COPY ALL PARTIES |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
04-11-2011 - Jury Demand CV - DC1016792 - 3830253 JURY DEMAND |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
04-08-2011 - Motion - Leave CV - DC1016792 - 3810625 MOTION - LEAVE TO DESIGNATE RESP 3RD PARTY |
|
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
04-08-2011 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1016792 - 3810627 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.