Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pfv Realty Iii Lp, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Bowns, Daniels S, against Bahhur, Faye, Tm Premier Wireless Group Llc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2010MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: April 04, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION EXE (1) 212/295 - MAIL ATTY |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
ISSUE WRIT CAN NOT ISSUE UNTIL 5-6-11 JG |
|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
04-04-2011 - Motion - Judgment CV - DC1016781 - 3766562 MOTION - JUDGMENT |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION F/Judg against both Def entered on 2/24/11 |
|
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER - INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS SUBMITTED INTERLOC DFLT JUDGMT*ADMIN |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-17-2011 - Certificate of Attorney CV - DC1016781 - 3357754 CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT SERVICEMEMBERS |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
02-17-2011 - Motion - Default Judgment CV - DC1016781 - 3357755 MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.