Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Texas State Of, filed a(n) Other (Civil) - State Agency case represented by De Diego, Armando, Robinson, Robert, Robinson, Steven, against Grove, Robert W, Renaissance Pilgrimages Inc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with CORTEZ, CARLOS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryOther (Civil) - State Agency |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 24, 2011ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: October 12, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2010ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: October 12, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS - FINANCIALS | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT JUDGMENT - ATTY |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
10-20-2011 - Designate Lead Counsel CV - DC1016756 - 5854081 DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL NEW ATTY IN CHARGE |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
10-12-2011 - Order - Mediation - DC Civ M - DC1016756 - 169 - 5822751 ORDER - MEDIATION COPY ALL |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
10-12-2011 - Order - Pretrial - DC Civ M - DC1016756 - 168 - 5822750 ORDER - PRETRIAL COPY ALL |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-24-2011 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1016756 - 3207832 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.