Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rathburn, Lou, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harter, Kenneth Stuart, against Professional Bank Na, The Systems Group Inc., Veritex Community Bank, represented by Almon, Johnnie L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 01, 2011ORDER - MISC.
Date: February 21, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: December 29, 2010AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 19, 2011ORDER - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: December 29, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 17, 2011ORDER - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: February 16, 2011ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: March 01, 2011APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: December 29, 2010AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 27, 2011AMENDED PETITION
Date: February 08, 2011RELEASE OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2011ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: October 14, 2011ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: September 20, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
12-06-2011 - Release of Judgment CV - DC1016694 - 6460815 RELEASE OF JUDGMENT |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
10-14-2011 - Order - Nonsuit - DC Civ M - DC1016694 - 176 - 5758731 ORDER - NONSUIT AMENDED - VERITEX COMMUNITY BANK |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Hearing held, judgment entered - FLy |
|
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS NOTICE OF JUDGMT MAILED |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
9-20-2011 - Order - Nonsuit - DC Civ M - DC1016694 - 995 - 5488465 ORDER - NONSUIT |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
09-19-2011 - Amended Petition CV - DC1016694 - 5437937 AMENDED PETITION SECOND |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-03-2011 - Return of Service CV - DC1016694 - 3470281 RETURN OF SERVICE SOS |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-01-2011 - Scheduling Order - DC Civ M - DC1016694 - 565 - 3489601 SCHEDULING ORDER |
|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
03-01-2011 - Order - Mediation - DC Civ M - DC1016694 - 581 - 3489616 ORDER - MEDIATION |
|
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Answer filed - F Ly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.