Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Bobby R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lafitte, Lucas S, against Poclain Hydraulics Inc, Quigley, Donald, represented by Driskell, Denise A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMITH, CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Griselda |
|
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION judgmt due |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS TO ADM O/DISMISS |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
09-16-2011 - Motion - Dismiss CV - DC1016258 - 5430457 MOTION - DISMISS |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE MEDIATION-SETTLED |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION DIANA M ROMERO |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION JOHN PETER SMITH HOSPITAL |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION | |
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY N/DEPO |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial jury fee paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.