Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, O Foreclosure, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Donnelly, Rachel U., against Elich, James E, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with JORDAN, JIM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2010 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: March 31, 2010MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: May 13, 2010MOTION - NONSUIT
Date: October 06, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 10, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
10-6-2010 - Motion - NonSuit CV - DC1003762 - 2584472 MOTION - NONSUIT |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
09-10-2010 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1003762 - 2428683 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
September 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Prove-Up PLTF |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
6-18-2010 - Notice of Hearing-Fiat CV - DC1003762 - 2007052 NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT E-FILED------PLTF |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Check status re Default Foreclosure Order |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
5-13-2010 - Motion - Miscellaneous CV - DC1003762 - 1845286 MOTION - MISCELLANOUS E-FILED----M/ENTRY OF ORDER |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
4-1-2010 - Miscellaneous Event CV - DC1003762 - 1687669 MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-FILED-----NOTICE REGARDING FORECLOSURE |
|
March 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
3-31-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1003762 - 1687723 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.