Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Pollock Investments Incorporated, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Singer, Gregory Z, against Vargas, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2010 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 20, 2011ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: March 31, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
ABSTRACT JUDGMENT MAIL ATTY |
|
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
01-20-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1003725 - 3216414 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE COURT FEES ISSUE ABSTRACT JUDG |
|
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT JUDGMENT | |
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUE ABSTRACT | |
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS SUBMITTED (FINAL DEFAULT JUDG) |
|
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
9-14-2010 - Certificate of Last Known Address CV - DC1003725 - 2464017 CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS E-FILED |
|
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
9-14-2010 - Affidavit CV - DC1003725 - 2463954 AFFIDAVIT E-FILED LEGAL FEES |
|
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
9-14-2010 - Motion - Default Judgment CV - DC1003725 - 2463850 MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT E-FILED W/PROPOSED ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.