Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
White, Toni, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Breeland, Lyn, against Wilson, Magalene, represented by Ramos, Tracy H., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 30, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA)
Date: March 30, 2010CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 18, 2010VACATION LETTER
Date: July 20, 2010ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 05, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Tracy Ramos Deft's atty has vac letter on file. |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
09-02-2010 - Certificate of Deposition CV - DC1003708 - 2510256 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
August 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
08-27-2010 - Rule 11 CV - DC1003708 - 2510257 RULE 11 |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
08-18-2010 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC1003708 - 2555646 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER | |
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
07-20-2010 - Vacation Letter - DC Civ P - DC1003708 - 2555647 VACATION LETTER |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
05-05-2010 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC1003708 - 2510260 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
05-05-2010 - Jury Demand CV - DC1003708 - 2510261 JURY DEMAND |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
03-30-2010 - Original Petition (OCA) CV - DC1003708 - 2510263 ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.