Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gt Dallas Properties Llc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Gruber, G Michael, against Galleria Mall Investors Lp, represented by Swanson, David Lance, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLAUGHTER, GENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
05-07-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC0917282 - 8418499 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
01-25-2012 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC0917282 - 8496580 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
11-22-2011 - Objection CV - DC0917282 - 6280933 OBJECTION TO VISITING JUDGE |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
9-19-2011 - Response CV - DC0917282 - 5436697 RESPONSE M/SJ |
|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
9-19-2011 - Special Exceptions - DC Civ P - DC0917282 - 5436698 SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
06-03-2011 - Original Answer - General Denial CV - DC0917282 - 4385451 ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
06-03-2011 - Jury Demand CV - DC0917282 - 4385673 JURY DEMAND |
|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
05-04-2011 - Correspondence - Letter to File CV - DC0917282 - 4110279 CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE ORIGINAL PETITION & VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTION RELIEF |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Temporary Injunction CASE NONSUITED PER ATTY FOR PLT AND DEF/ATTY JASON ADAMS - ATTY WERE ALL ON CONF CALL |
|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
05-10-2010 - Order - Nonsuit - DC Civ M - DC0917282 - 408 - 1825563 ORDER - NONSUIT ON BASE PLT x DEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.