Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tib - The Independent Bankersbank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mcmillon, Wendy A, against Matheson, Christy, Matheson, John, Camelot Health Care System Of Dequincy Inc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with JORDAN, JIM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Notice of Intent to Dismiss |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
April 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION SOS/COI/COH/HAG | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.