Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
O Foreclosure, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Smith, J Allen, against Gardner, Rosemary, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MURPHY, MARY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
MOTION - MISCELLANOUS M/DEFAULT |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT/M/DEFAULT & CERT OF LAST KNOW MAILING ADD |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT SVCMEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Status Conference NOT A HEARING DOCKETING PURPOSES ONLY |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR DISMISSAL HEARING NOTICE MAILED. |
|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT CERT OF COMPLIANCE W/RULE 736 |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.