Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Molleur, Mike, Molleur, Laura J, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Tittle, Don A, Mueller, Paulette, against Debord, Bryant Wayne, represented by Hight, Brenda Neel, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION - DISMISS AGREED JOINT M/ALL PTY'S W/PREJUDICE |
|
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING D/M/DISMISS (ATTY FEES, PAGE 6) |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER - PARTIAL DISMISSAL | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION - MISCELLANOUS SUPPL. M/CONTINUANCE |
|
November 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion - Dismiss | |
October 09, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION - CONTINUANCE | |
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion - Dismiss & D/STRIKE |
|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE D/SUPPL. M/DISMISS & M/STRIKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.