Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Marcus, Sr., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Smith, Houston Madison, against Allstate Indemnity Company, represented by Allen, David G, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with RAGGIO, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Hearing Submission/Jury trial |
|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS BALIFF FEE SHEET/DL |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COURT W/O JUGMENT - DEF |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT JURY NOTE #1 |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT R & R VERDICT-NO LIABILITY UNANIMOUS |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT REQUESTED DEFINITION #5 |
|
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT PL/PAGE/LINE DSGN /MARCUS WILLIAMS SR. |
|
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | JURY SWORN PANEL (OCA) | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil Jury verdict rec'd |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.