Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Jensen, Dale D, against Flores, Ruben, Two Thousand Nine Hundred Fifteen Dollars In United States Currency, represented by Alonzo, Roberto R, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with JOHNSON, KAREN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategorySeizure/Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE SIGNED; COPY ALL PARTIES |
|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER | |
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER MAILED ALL PARTIES |
|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL 11-5-2007 MAILED ALL PARTIES |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
MOTION HEARING DEFAULT REVIEW |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT SOLDIER'S AND SAILORS |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.