Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garner, Ruth West, against Virrueta, Nelis, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with SMITH, CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISMISSAL | |
September 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COURT W/ORDER - PL |
|
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
August 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion - Summary Judgment | |
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION - DISMISS | |
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
MOTION - CONTINUANCE PLT |
|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT SUGGESTION/BANKRUPTCY |
|
July 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion - Summary Judgment 15 MINS |
|
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT | |
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.