Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cozine, Philbert Estat, Cozine, Denisha, Cozine, Alexis Raven, Cozine, Dorothy Caroly, Cozine, Sandra D Etalg, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Nowak, Matthew, against Davidson, James A Md, Wagner, Harold G Md, Wagner, Latonna, Wall, Bruce R Md, Brown, Nurse C, (total of 15) See All represented by Thornton, Russell G, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with PATTERSON, JAY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2004 | Docket Event | RECORDS/PARKLAND MEM | |
November 04, 2003 | Docket Event | CONF REC/SENT TO RED | |
October 24, 2003 | Docket Event | MCCATHERN MOOTY LLP | |
October 24, 2003 | Docket Event | TRANSFRD | |
October 10, 2003 | Docket Event | C/C TRSF TO HUNT | |
October 10, 2003 | Docket Event | RECORDS/BAPTIST ST A | |
October 01, 2003 | Docket Event | SENT TO TRSF DESK | |
September 29, 2003 | Docket Event | O/TRSF VENUE | |
August 29, 2003 | Docket Event | RECORDS/PAIN CONTROL | |
August 29, 2003 | Docket Event | RECORDS/CARDIOLOGY & |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.