Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Redi-Carpet Sales Of Dall, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Thomas, David Erwin, against Northwest Terrace Apa, Terrance Partners Lp Dba, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with EVANS, DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategorySworn Account |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2003 | Docket Event | RET/RECORDS | |
June 02, 2003 | Docket Event | RELEASE JUDGMENT | |
May 12, 2003 | Docket Event | RET EXEC 1 UNX PCT 3 | |
April 28, 2003 | Docket Event | ISS A/J MAIL ATTY | |
April 28, 2003 | Docket Event | ISS EXEC 1 PCT 3 | |
April 17, 2003 | Docket Event | THOMAS SELF | |
March 17, 2003 | Docket Event | SNT/RECORDS | |
March 14, 2003 | Docket Event | O/DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
January 30, 2003 | Docket Event | LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
January 30, 2003 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.