Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ringer, Catherine, Ringer, George David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jones, Ralph Cole, against Lang, Mark, represented by Payne, Brett H, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with CANALES, ADOLPH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2002 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2003 | Docket Event | SENT TO RCDS | |
August 11, 2003 | Docket Event | CERT DEPO/RINGER CAT | |
August 11, 2003 | Docket Event | CERT DEPO/RINGER GEO | |
August 11, 2003 | Docket Event | CERT DEPO/LANG MARK | |
July 25, 2003 | Docket Event | O/JUDGMT | |
April 30, 2003 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGRMNT | |
April 25, 2003 | Docket Event | O/MODIFY | |
March 03, 2003 | Docket Event | M/MODIFY | |
February 14, 2003 | Docket Event | O/MEDIATION | |
February 07, 2003 | Docket Event | AMD ANS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.