Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of Texas N A, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Elrod, David W, against Barringer, Lynn A, represented by Schurr, Patrick Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with JOHNSON, KAREN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHNSON, KAREN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2002 | Docket Event | N/CHANGE ADDRESS | |
March 15, 2002 | Docket Event | RET EXEC 2 N/B PCT 3 | |
February 13, 2002 | Docket Event | RET EXEC 1 UNEX SHF | |
December 12, 2001 | Docket Event | EXEC 2 PCT 2 | |
November 07, 2001 | Docket Event | ROCHELLE ELROD HUTCH | |
July 11, 2001 | Docket Event | ISS EXEC 1 PCT 2 | |
July 06, 2001 | Docket Event | ROCHELLE ELROD HU | |
July 06, 2001 | Docket Event | ROCHELLE ELROD | |
April 10, 2001 | Docket Event | *** SENT/RECORDS *** | |
April 04, 2001 | Docket Event | O/AGRD JUDGMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.