Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hcc Contracting Inc Dba, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Rusthoven, Jeff, against Townbank N A, represented by O'Dens, David M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with JUDICIAL, OFFICER DC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDICIAL, OFFICER DC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2001 | Docket Event | JKT SENT TO RECORDS | |
October 12, 2001 | Docket Event | O/DISMISS | |
September 13, 2001 | Docket Event | M/PROTECT | |
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event | N/RULE 11 | |
July 13, 2001 | Docket Event | O/APPEAL-DENIED | |
June 07, 2001 | Docket Event | N/APPEAL MASTER | |
June 04, 2001 | Docket Event | MASTERS REPORT | |
May 30, 2001 | Docket Event | REPLY/RESP/M/S/J | |
May 18, 2001 | Docket Event | RESP/M/S/J | |
April 04, 2001 | Docket Event | M/S/J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.