Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guilliams, Clarke, Guilliams, Elizabeth Etvir, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Barber, James Conner, against Unknown Distributor, Monsanto Company, G D Searle & Co Etal, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with EVANS, DAVID presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEVANS, DAVID Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2001 | Docket Event | SNT/RECORDS | |
February 14, 2001 | Docket Event | O/CLOSE FILE | |
February 09, 2001 | Docket Event | N/REMOVAL FED CRT | |
January 30, 2001 | Docket Event | RET CIT PPS | |
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event | RET CIT PPS | |
December 29, 2000 | Docket Event | CIT & COP ATTY | |
December 28, 2000 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL PETITION (OCA) Case Petitioned |
|
December 28, 2000 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND | |
December 28, 2000 | Docket Event | STATE INDIGENCE | |
December 28, 2000 | Docket Event | CONTINGENCY FUND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.