Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Demaio, Samuel J, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Carpenter, N Scott, against Grundfos Pump Corp, Total Air & Heat Co Etal, represented by Smith, Scott, Ekvall, Erik E, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with JUDICIAL, OFFICER DC presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJUDICIAL, OFFICER DC Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2000 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2004 | Docket Event | COUNTY TREASURER | |
June 10, 2002 | Docket Event | **SENT JKT RECORDS** | |
May 31, 2002 | Docket Event | O/DISMISS | |
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event | ANS/INTERVENTION | |
December 20, 2001 | Docket Event | O/CONTINUE | |
December 18, 2001 | Docket Event | M/CONTINUE | |
December 14, 2001 | Docket Event | 1ST AMD ANS | |
September 25, 2001 | Docket Event | ANS,SPEC EXCPT,DEFEN | |
September 18, 2001 | Docket Event | CARPENTER LAW FIRM | |
September 17, 2001 | Docket Event | PET INTERVENTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.