Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ayala, Kimberly Nikkol, represented by Layh, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 161st District Court with Low, Justin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLow, Justin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2022 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House161st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served 08/17/2023 MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Unserved MARK RAMON |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA(S) ISSUED (REQUESTED BY STATE) EMAILED TO INVESTIGATOR AND DA 08/17/2023 BY L.P |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY AUGUST 28, 2023 AT 9 AM, EMAILED TO S. LAYH, DA, APO, PSM AND ASA BONDING ON 08/17/2023 BY AM |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
STATE'S APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL, CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protective Order MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL; LORENA RAMON; EMAILED TO M. VACCO ON 08/17/23 BY B.L |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NTC OF INTENT TO USE EXTRANEOUS OFFENSES & PRIOR CONVICTIONS | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.