Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Smith, Thomas W., filed a(n) Property case represented by Bloomenstiel, Abraham C, against 1325 South Lamar Hotel Gp, Llc, 1325 South Lamar Hotel Lp, Aimbridge Hospitality, Llc, represented by Fee, Thomas W., Snell, Ashley M., Viccinelli, Gina, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House68th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 23, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 20, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 17, 2021ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: October 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2021MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 23, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 06, 2022Scheduling Conference
Date: November 29, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: October 07, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 23, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2021DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: November 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
68th Court-Jury Trial Setting Jury Trial - Civil 1ST SETTING ON DWOP - ATTY WILL GET BCK WITH THE COURT ON A MEDIATOR...MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3)-THOMAS FEE NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED AGREED TAKE NOTHING JDGMNT ORDER TO CLERKS |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD TAKE NOTHING JUDGMNT TO JUDGE FOR REV |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
68th COVER SHEET - hearing notice form Scheduling Conference ***WAITING ON SCHEDULING ORDER*** MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF FILING |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) PLAINTIFF'S |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - 1325 SOUTH LAMAR HOTEL, GP, LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.