Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fleming, Steven Ray, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ross, Benton G, against Blanson, Darrell, The Salvation Army, represented by Castagna, Lynn S, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with ACEVES, MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 08, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 20, 2021MOTION - RETAIN
Date: January 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 04, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: January 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 12, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 06, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 20, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 07, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 22, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: March 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 03, 2022MOTION - MEDIATION
Date: March 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 08, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 24, 2022SETTLED
Date: December 09, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 03, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: April 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 18, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 03, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 20, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 04, 2022ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET
Date: April 06, 2023MOTION - RETAIN
Date: April 06, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: May 05, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Notice Final Disposition Hearing |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
2ND UNOPPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S 2ND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET MOTION - RETAIN - 2ND UNOPPOSED |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED 2ND UNOPPOSED ORDER TO RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT - 2ND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa Jury Trial - Civil |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Hearing | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET - UNOPPOSED |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET MOTION - RETAIN - UNOPPOSED |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER UNOPPOSED RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.